Register of Charities - The Charity Commission THE TEMPLE BALSALL AMALGAMATED CHARITIES
Charity number: 1146710-2
Linked charity
Governing document
SCHEME DATED 10 JUN 1888
AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 10 JUL 1888
AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 25 MAR 1891
AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 19 APR 2024
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THOSE IN FINANCIAL NEED, THE ELDERLY AND THOSE IN POOR HEALTH BY
PROVIDING ACCOMMODATION SERVICES OR FACILITIES TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH
PERSONS
Area of benefit
PARISH OF TEMPLE BALSALL (AS CONSTITUTED ON 10 JULY 1888)
Registration history
- 11 April 1963: Standard registration
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.