Trustees THE UNITED CHARITY OF WILLIAM AVERY AND OTHERS
Charity number: 215515

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy Jerrard-Dinn | Chair | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Rachel McKeown | Trustee | 15 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lois Ann Brough | Trustee | 15 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rev STEVE MEDLEY | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Catherine ann Mary France | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Robert Greenaway | Trustee | 12 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
SUZANNE MARY WHITING | Trustee | 23 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
ALFRED ROBERT PARGETTER | Trustee | 23 November 2011 |
|
|||||
CHARLES WILLIAM ANTROBUS | Trustee | 23 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM HARGREAVES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.