THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE QUEEN VICTORIA HOSPITAL EAST GRINSTEAD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity's main purpose, as set out in the governing document, is to raise funds to provide amenities for patients and staff at the Queen Victoria Hospital.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- West Sussex
Governance
- 31 January 1963: Standard registration
- THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE QUEEN VICTORIA AND ST LEONARD'S HOSPITALS EAST GRINSTEAD (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alban StJohn Brown | Chair | 21 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Judy Busby | Trustee | 25 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Linda Vera Skinner | Trustee | 13 June 2017 |
|
|||||
Alexandra Beryl Durrant | Trustee | 13 June 2017 |
|
|||||
CHRISTINE ELIZABETH REA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.87k | £36.49k | £118.04k | £444.31k | £54.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.23k | £267.38k | £122.24k | £85.46k | £87.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 November 2020 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 02 November 2020 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES AND CONSTITUTION APPROVED 29TH MAY 1961 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION PASSEDN17 JUNE 1963 as amended on 26 Jun 2018 as amended on 20 Sep 2021 as amended on 13 Oct 2022 as amended on 11 Sep 2023
Charitable objects
TO MOBILISE, ENCOURAGE, FOSTER AND MAINTAIN THE INTEREST OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PATIENTS AND THE SUPPORT OF THE WORK OF THE QUEEN VICTORIA HOSPITAL, EAST GRIMSTEAD. (FOR DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF THE RULES).
Area of benefit
EAST GRINSTEAD AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cobble Court
Hammerwood
EAST GRINSTEAD
RH19 3QE
- Phone:
- 07720077999
- Email:
- 1inda@cobblecourt.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window