CHESHIRE PLOUGHING AND HEDGECUTTING SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Running The Cheshire Ploughing & Hedge Laying Match,
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 12 March 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doug Richardson | Trustee | 06 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Ball | Trustee | 01 March 2016 |
|
|||||
George Hough | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Keith Dulson | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
EDWARD BOWEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARK BARLOW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN HALSALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW KNOWLES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEVEN RICHARDSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID BROCK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GEOFFREY BRIGGS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ARNOLD PLUMLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.77k | £4.99k | £9.33k | £96.99k | £91.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £60.02k | £14.38k | £20.74k | £32.05k | £79.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 November 2022 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 March 2022 | 149 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 September 2021 | 312 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 08 September 2021 | 312 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES 1920
Charitable objects
1. TO IMPROVE AND FURTHER THE INTERESTS OF AGRICULTURAL EDUCATION BY PROMOTING SUCH COMPETITIONS AND DEMONSTRATIONS IN THE ART OF PLOUGHING, HEDGECUTTING. 2. TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE CRAFTMANSHIP IN AGRICULTURAL WORKERS. 3. TO ASSIST OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY OTHER ASSOCIATION OR SOCIETY WHOSE OBJECTS ARE SIMILAR
Area of benefit
CHESHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fields View
Elton Road
SANDBACH
SANDBACH
CW11 2UT
- Phone:
- 01270 765404
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window