THE ROBERT MOSS CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
102 Education/Training 105 Relief of Poverty
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 10 December 1962: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTHONY JOHN BENSKIN | Trustee | 05 October 2011 |
|
|||||
GRAHAM SIDNEY FRECKELTON | Trustee |
|
||||||
MALCOLM FRECKELTON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.13k | £4.11k | £3.90k | £3.84k | £3.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.75k | £13.64k | £16.05k | £14.15k | £20.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SETTLEMENT DATED 31ST OCTOBER 1962. ALTERED BY SCHEME DATED 28TH JANUARY 2004
Charitable objects
FOR OR TOWARDS THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONG PERSONS WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN EMPLOYED IN ANY CAPACITY IN THE BUILDING TRADE IN ENGLAND AND THE WIVES WIDOWS CHILDREN OR DEPENDANTS OF ANY SUCH PERSONS. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONG PERSONS WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN SO EMPLOYED AS AFORESAID AND THEIR CHILDREN.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
MOSS SOLICITORS
80-81 WOODGATE
LOUGHBOROUGH
LE11 2XE
- Phone:
- 01509217770
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window