JOSEPH WEBSTER'S CHARITY

Charity number: 216393
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Relief of poverty in the Parish of Duffield, Milford, Belper and Heage in Derbyshire

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £2,666
Total expenditure: £2,180

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Derbyshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 November 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE DUFFIELD CHARITY (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Marion Elizabeth TAULBUT Chair
THE DUFFIELD ENDOWED SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
DUFFIELD AND LITTLE EATON TRUST FOR GOSPEL MINISTRY
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ALKMUNDS DUFFIELD
Received: On time
Judith Mary Eisenberg Trustee 23 November 2023
None on record
Elizabeth Alexandra Sheppard Trustee 23 November 2023
None on record
Anna Mary Maddison Trustee 01 July 2023
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ALKMUNDS DUFFIELD
Received: On time
Dr BARBARA LEYLAND Trustee 08 November 2017
None on record
Alastair Boyd Trustee 25 May 2017
None on record
Judith Clough Trustee 21 May 2014
None on record
Peter John Walker Trustee 18 November 2013
THE DUFFIELD ENDOWED SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
KEITH REDFERN Trustee
None on record
MR STUART HOLMES Trustee
None on record
DOCTOR CHRIS BRENTNALL Trustee
THE DUFFIELD ENDOWED SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £3.40k £2.38k £2.43k £2.50k £2.67k
Total expenditure £2.55k £2.60k £2.37k £2.67k £2.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 04 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 26 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 13 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
95 Eaton Bank
Duffield
BELPER
Derbyshire
DE56 4BH
Phone:
07870 355040
Website:

No information available