THE ROYAL SURGICAL AID SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Dementia Carers Count is the working name for The Royal Surgical Aid Society. We provide space for family carers of people with dementia to inspire them to learn, connect and receive practical support to feel empowered in their caring role. We invest in research to understand family carers? experiences, needs and desired outcomes, and campaign to improve the support they receive.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £55,383 from 2 government contract(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£70k to £80k | 2 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 01 February 1968: Standard registration
- AGECARE - ROYAL SURGICAL AID SOCIETY (Working name)
- DEMENTIA CARERS COUNT (Working name)
- RSAS AGECARE (Working name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sally-Anne Tsangarides | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Liz Jones | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Vellingiri Raja Badrakalimuthu | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Wells | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dean Cassar | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Gaynor Hillier | Trustee | 16 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Anne A'Bear | Trustee | 20 February 2019 |
|
|||||
Julie Anne Flower | Trustee | 20 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
David James Goodridge | Trustee | 16 August 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £233.00k | £320.00k | £617.79k | £346.51k | £433.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.08m | £1.05m | £1.27m | £1.68m | £1.94m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £19.09k | £55.38k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £375.04k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £242.76k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £267.80k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £1.25m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £21.28k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £11.73k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £16.62k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 08 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15/01/1953 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/01/1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/10/1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/03/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19/07/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/03/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16 OCT 2017 as amended on 06 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
1 PROVIDING EDUCATION AND SKILLS TRAINING, ADVICE AND INFORMATION, SUPPORT AND THERAPEUTIC SERVICES TO SUCH PERSONS; 2 ADVANCING RESEARCH INTO THE NEEDS OF SUCH PERSONS; AND 3 EXPLOITING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH TO ENHANCE THE QUALITY OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS AND IMPROVE THE SUPPORT AND OTHER SERVICES AVAILABLE TO THEM
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 01 February 1968 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
Canopi
Unit A
Arc House
82 Tanner Street
LONDON
SE1 3GN
- Phone:
- 020 3096 7894
- Email:
- info@dementiacarers.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window