Accounts and annual returns BEDINGHAM CHARITIES

Charity number: 217128
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 July 2023 05 March 2025 305 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 04 July 2022 18 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 04 July 2021 25 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 04 July 2020 09 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 04 July 2019 24 June 2020 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 July 2019 Not Required