ST LEONARD'S HOSPITAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Alms Housing for the elderly
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 03 June 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 18 June 1986: Standard registration
- ST LEONARDS HOSPITAL TRUST (Working name)
- Homes England
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RITA CROWE | Trustee | 25 January 2024 |
|
|||||||
Jennifer Oliver | Trustee | 07 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Neil Ross | Trustee | 07 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Ian Phillips | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Mathew Skinner | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|||||||
Max Cope | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Vanda Barnard | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Paul Simpson | Trustee | 07 March 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Graham Hicks | Trustee | 12 March 2014 |
|
|
||||||
Jane Fawcett | Trustee | 12 March 2014 |
|
|
||||||
JEAN MOORE MBE JP | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 03/06/2020 | 03/06/2021 | 03/06/2022 | 03/06/2023 | 03/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £310.09k | £346.15k | £341.28k | £352.90k | £387.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £358.11k | £276.14k | £374.52k | £343.25k | £343.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £8.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 03 June 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 June 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 03 June 2023 | 01 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 June 2023 | 01 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 03 June 2022 | 24 April 2023 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 June 2022 | 24 April 2023 | 21 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 03 June 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
03 June 2021
(These accounts |
28 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 03 June 2020 | 16 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 June 2020 | 16 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 18/06/1986 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 02/07/2012 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 23/03/2015
Charitable objects
1) THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF ALMSHOUSES FOR PERSONS OF AT LEAST FIFTY YEARS OF AGE. 2) RELIEF IN NEED IN RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN NEWARK OR IN ONE OF THE PARISHES OF BALDERTON, ELSTON AND GIRTON WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NEWARK OR ONE OF THE PARISHES OF BALDERTON,ELSTON AND GIRTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
48 Lombard Street
NEWARK
NG24 1XP
- Phone:
- 01636640649
- Email:
- egamage@paynegamage.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window