Financial history BIRMINGHAM COMMON GOOD TRUST

Charity number: 217455
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £9.06k £9.97k £11.26k £11.67k £12.35k
Total expenditure £7.44k £9.76k £13.26k £10.03k £9.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A