SUSSEX COUNTY FOOTBALL ASSOCIATION BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
__The object of the charity is to provide financial support to those who paticipate in Association Football as members of Clubs affiliated to the Sussex County Football Association Ltd.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- East Sussex
- Surrey
- West Sussex
Governance
- 06 November 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Elvis Atkins | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen John Walker | Trustee | 25 June 2020 |
|
|||||
Thura Kyaw Thu Win | Trustee | 25 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jack Woolsey | Trustee | 25 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Wayne Sargeant | Trustee | 25 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
John William Edwards | Trustee | 25 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Charles Robert Cameron Dudley | Trustee | 25 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Michael Benham | Trustee | 25 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Susan Symons | Trustee | 25 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.60k | £7.86k | £5.72k | £6.49k | £4.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.75k | £2.98k | £1.92k | £3.45k | £1.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 13 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 14 August 2024 | 167 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 23 March 2023 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 21 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES OF BENEVOLENT FUND AMENDED BY SCHEME OF 20 JANUARY 1997, AND BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 10 APRIL 2003 AND 15 MAY 2008.
Charitable objects
TO MAKE GRANTS TO ANY OF THE FOLLOWING PERSONS WHO MAY BE FROM TIME TO TIME IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES 1) MEMBERS OF CLUBS AFFILIATED TO THE SUSSEX COUNTY FOOTBALL ASSOCIATION. 2) PERSONS WHO HAVE RENDERED SERVICES TO THE GAME AND/OR THEIR NEAR RELATIVES OR DEPENDANTS
Area of benefit
SUSSEX COUNTY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sussex County Football Association
Culver Road
LANCING
West Sussex
BN15 9AX
- Phone:
- 01903 753547
- Email:
- info@sussexfa.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window