Financial history BARNACK POOR'S ESTATE

Charity Number: 217569
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £9.73k £11.57k £10.96k £9.73k £10.48k
Total expenditure £6.51k £6.29k £9.06k £7.78k £53.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A