ST. SWITHIN'S CHURCH LANDS TRUST

Charity number: 217585
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To look after the Church of St. Swithins' in Lincoln and the land around the church

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £3,747
Total expenditure: £5,850

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Lincolnshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 July 1982: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ST. SWITHIN'S CHURCH LANDS TRUST (Working name)
  • CHURCH LANDS (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

22 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev James Prestwood Chair 23 July 2014
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF LINCOLN ST SWITHIN
Received: On time
ST SWITHIN'S COMMUNITY CENTRE
Received: On time
Thomas William Herbert Trustee 28 April 2024
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF LINCOLN ST SWITHIN
Received: On time
Gail Louise Fields Trustee 28 April 2024
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF LINCOLN ST SWITHIN
Received: On time
Dale Newman Trustee 28 April 2024
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF LINCOLN ST SWITHIN
Received: On time
Ryan Anthony Rawlinson Trustee 28 April 2024
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF LINCOLN ST SWITHIN
Received: On time
Dr Michael Ross Glenfield Trustee 28 April 2024
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF LINCOLN ST SWITHIN
Received: On time
Rev JOHN CAMERON WATT Trustee 31 January 2024
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF LINCOLN ST SWITHIN
Received: On time
DAVID ATKINSON CHARITY
Received: On time
ELIZA BENTLEY FOR CHOIR
Received: On time
CHARLES BELLWOOD CHARITY
Received: On time
Rev Victoria Margaret Lawrence Trustee 25 June 2023
None on record
Andrew Shepherd Trustee 23 April 2023
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF LINCOLN ST SWITHIN
Received: On time
Jennifer Lorraine Moat Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
Rev Benjamin Jonathan Willis Trustee 05 July 2022
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF LINCOLN ST SWITHIN
Received: On time
Rev Juliette Sophie Willis Trustee 05 July 2022
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF LINCOLN ST SWITHIN
Received: On time
Rosemary Anne Brooks Trustee 09 May 2022
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF LINCOLN ST SWITHIN
Received: On time
Callum William Roper Trustee 26 April 2021
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF LINCOLN ST SWITHIN
Received: On time
Jane Louise Pickersgill Trustee 25 April 2021
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF LINCOLN ST SWITHIN
Received: On time
John Crowder Trustee 18 October 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF LINCOLN ST SWITHIN
Received: On time
Daniel Robert Chard Trustee 28 April 2019
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF LINCOLN ST SWITHIN
Received: On time
ST SWITHIN'S COMMUNITY CENTRE
Received: On time
Mark Perry Trustee 28 April 2019
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF LINCOLN ST SWITHIN
Received: On time
Susan Barbara Elizabeth Watt Trustee 30 April 2018
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF LINCOLN ST SWITHIN
Received: On time
THE LINCOLN DIOCESAN TRUST AND BOARD OF FINANCE LTD
Received: On time
ST SWITHIN'S COMMUNITY CENTRE
Received: On time
Dr Phil Williams Trustee 30 April 2018
None on record
Richard John Lambert Trustee 01 May 2016
None on record
RACHEL CAROL TYRRELL Trustee 24 March 2016
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF LINCOLN ST SWITHIN
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.64k £1.52k £590 £992 £3.75k
Total expenditure £3.00k £4.00k £0 £2.50k £5.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 16 October 2024 351 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 29 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 January 2021 80 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
LANDS TRUST FOUNDED BY WILL PROVED AT LEEDS 4 NOVEMBER 1981
Charitable objects
AN ACCRETION TO THE ENDOMENT OF ST SWITHIN'S CHURCH CHARITY FOR THE GENRAL PURPOSE OF THE SAID CHARITY
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ST SWITHIN
Registration history
  • 16 July 1982 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
St. Swithins Church
St. Swithins Square
Lincoln
LN2 1HA
Phone:
01522 536451