Financial history RAVENSTONE HOSPITAL ALMSHOUSE CHARITY

Charity number: 217605
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £83.85k £97.33k £98.96k £104.38k £109.74k
Total expenditure £116.85k £89.96k £108.58k £104.83k £93.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A