Trustees RAVENSTONE HOSPITAL ALMSHOUSE CHARITY

Charity number: 217605
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gareth Michael Braithwaite Chair 17 November 2021
None on record
Lucy Elizabeth Cure Trustee 13 November 2024
None on record
DAVID BATES Trustee 22 November 2023
None on record
ELLIOTT GERRALD CHARLES ALLMAN Trustee 14 June 2023
None on record
NICHOLAS EASTWOOD Trustee 13 July 2022
None on record
REBECCA RILEY Trustee 20 November 2019
HOSPICE HOPE
Received: On time
ARTHUR JOHN PAINE Trustee 15 November 2017
None on record
PETER NICHOLAS TUDOR-JONES Trustee 16 November 2015
None on record