Financial history CHARITY OF JOHN SPENDLUFFE

Charity number: 218028
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £5.25k £3.72k £3.88k £2.29k £4.91k
Total expenditure £2.20k £4.80k £9.63k £2.68k £2.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A