THE SIR THOMAS WHITE LOAN CHARITY

Charity number: 218061
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Charity loans amounts up to £20,000 interest free for nine years to persons aged over 18 and under 45 setting up their own business within Leicester(shire) or Rutland, Loans for post-graduate education up to £10,000, interest free for nine years to persons aged over 18 and under 45, who have lived in Leicester(shire)/Rutland for at least 3 years.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £415,885
Total expenditure: £328,920

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Leicester City
  • Leicestershire
  • Rutland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 September 1964: Standard registration
  • 26 February 2000: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • SIR THOMAS WHITE LOAN CHARITY (Working name)
  • THE LOAN CHARITIES OF SIR THOMAS WHITE, ROBERT HEYRICK AND JOHN PARKER (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Financial Conduct Authority
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LUCY JANE WOMACK Chair 11 July 2013
THE JOHN HEGGS BATES' CHARITY FOR CONVALESCENTS
Received: On time
UPPINGHAM SCHOOL
Received: On time
Mark James Sandall Trustee 02 December 2024
THE JOHN HEGGS BATES' CHARITY FOR CONVALESCENTS
Received: On time
Phillip Brian Cox Trustee 02 December 2024
THE JOHN HEGGS BATES' CHARITY FOR CONVALESCENTS
Received: On time
Linda Neville Trustee 03 June 2024
THE JOHN HEGGS BATES' CHARITY FOR CONVALESCENTS
Received: On time
Samantha Caroline Purvis Trustee 04 December 2023
THE JOHN HEGGS BATES' CHARITY FOR CONVALESCENTS
Received: On time
Mahomed Imtiaz Umar Trustee 05 September 2022
THE JOHN HEGGS BATES' CHARITY FOR CONVALESCENTS
Received: On time
Parmdeep Singh Vadesha Trustee 06 June 2022
THE JOHN HEGGS BATES' CHARITY FOR CONVALESCENTS
Received: On time
Paul Brian Douglas Murray Trustee 06 December 2021
None on record
Gregory Hollingsworth Trustee 02 December 2019
THE JOHN HEGGS BATES' CHARITY FOR CONVALESCENTS
Received: On time
Susan Jane Cleminson Trustee 02 December 2019
THE JOHN HEGGS BATES' CHARITY FOR CONVALESCENTS
Received: On time
Ivan Richard Court CMgr FCMI Trustee 05 March 2018
THE JOHN HEGGS BATES' CHARITY FOR CONVALESCENTS
Received: On time
ANNE CLARE WHITLOCK Trustee 07 September 2015
THE JOHN HEGGS BATES' CHARITY FOR CONVALESCENTS
Received: On time
Amjad Khan Trustee 02 March 2015
THE JOHN HEGGS BATES' CHARITY FOR CONVALESCENTS
Received: On time
Gaurang Naik Trustee 02 June 2014
THE JOHN HEGGS BATES' CHARITY FOR CONVALESCENTS
Received: On time
Lisa Louise Botterill Trustee 02 June 2014
THE JOHN HEGGS BATES' CHARITY FOR CONVALESCENTS
Received: On time
DAVID ALAN HOPE FCA BSC Trustee
THE JOHN HEGGS BATES' CHARITY FOR CONVALESCENTS
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £306.71k £318.74k £335.65k £377.04k £415.89k
Total expenditure £160.89k £222.98k £305.50k £375.13k £328.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 17 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 17 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 05 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 05 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 29 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 29 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 16 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 16 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 14 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 26 AUGUST 1982.SCHEME 7 SEPT 1992.
Charitable objects
INCOME TO BE APLLIED IN MAKING INTEREST FREE LOANS OF NOT MORE THAN ú7,500 TO ANY ONE PERSON (OR SUCH OTHER SUM AS THE COMMISSIONERS APPROVE FROM TIME TO TIME FOR PERIODS OF NOT MORE THAN TEN YEARS TO PERSONS OF NOT MORE THAN 35 YEARS OF AGE WHO ARE RESIDENT, EMPLOYED OR CARRYING ON BUSINESS IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT FOR THE PURPOSE OF ESTABLISHING THEM IN THEIR CHOSEN OCCUPATION OR IN A WAY OF LIFE.(FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 8 OF SCHEME).
Area of benefit
CITY OF LEICESTER AND NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Registration history
  • 24 September 1964 : Standard registration
  • 26 February 2000 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
Sir Thomas White Loan Charity
Unit 5
Friars Mill
Bath Lane
LEICESTER
LE3 5BJ
Phone:
01162046620