DERBY CHILDREN'S SEASIDE HOME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides residential holidays for disadvantaged Derbyshire children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Derby City
- Derbyshire
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 10 September 1963: Standard registration
- 22 February 2024: Funds received from 265840 OLIVER '68
- DERBYSHIRE CHILDRENS HOLIDAY CENTRE (Working name)
- DERBY AND DERBYSHIRE CHILDREN'S SEASIDE HOME (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Evans | Trustee | 12 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Rhule | Trustee | 15 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
JulietteMarie Whitby | Trustee | 23 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN EMMERSON LAKE | Trustee | 23 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL COPESTAKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER WALKER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £292.80k | £243.55k | £188.22k | £260.48k | £426.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £398.48k | £186.64k | £143.21k | £317.78k | £392.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED POLL DATED 27 APRIL 1899. DEED OF APPOINTMENT OF PRESENT TRUSTEES DATED 31/12/1958
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A SEASIDE HOME FOR POOR CHILDREN RESIDING IN THE COUNTY BOROUGH OF DERBY AND IN THE COUNTY OF DERBY.
Area of benefit
COUNTY BOROUGH OF DERBY AND THE COUNTY OF DERBY
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Cosy
Unit 318G Fauld Industrial Estate
Fauld, Tutbury
BURTON-ON-TRENT
Staffordshire
DE13 9HS
- Phone:
- 01332345424
- Email:
- admin@dchc.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window