PILTON UNITED CHARITY

Charity Number: 218538
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide and maintain housing for poor persons from the ancient Parish of Pilton. To provide relief for residents in need from the ancient Parish of Pilton. To provide any other charitable purpose to benefit the inhabitants of the ancient Parish of Pilton.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £242,484
Total expenditure: £197,756

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 July 1963: Standard registration
  • 13 November 2002: Removed (Amalgamated)
  • 13 November 2002: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • PARISH LANDS AND OTHER CHARITIES (Previous name)
  • PILTON UNITED CHARITIES (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Janet Coates Chair
PILTON HOUSE TRUST
Received: On time
DAVIE BARNSTAPLE TRUST
Received: On time
Colin Brown Trustee 11 March 2025
None on record
Loki Dawson Trustee 11 March 2025
None on record
Julie Hunt Trustee 19 September 2023
THE SIR FRANCIS CHICHESTER APPEAL FOR THE YOUTH OF DEVON
Received: On time
William Sanders Trustee 20 June 2023
None on record
Iain Brodie Trustee 20 June 2023
None on record
Peter Manley Trustee 14 March 2023
None on record
Rev Martyn Tyrrell Trustee 13 March 2022
None on record
Michael John Willcox Trustee 11 October 2020
None on record
Francis Vernon Clarke Trustee 10 March 2020
None on record
MARK CROOKS Trustee 08 December 2015
None on record
VALERIE ELKINS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £173.91k £192.03k £209.80k £223.36k £242.48k
Total expenditure £195.59k £188.14k £146.58k £208.22k £197.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 09 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 09 May 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 12 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 05 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 25 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 25 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 25 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 25 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 05 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 05 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 26 JANUARY 1962
Charitable objects
1/ PROVISION OF ALMSHOUSES FOR POOR PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE ANCIENT PARISH OF PILTON. 2/ FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE POOR OF THE ANCIENT PARISH OF PILTON
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF PILTON
Registration history
  • 08 July 1963 : Standard registration
  • 13 November 2002 : Removed
  • 13 November 2002 : Asset transfer out

Contact information

Address:
Meeting Room 4A Foffee Cottages
Pilton
BARNSTAPLE
Devon
EX31 1QP
Phone:
07736218637
Website:

No information available