SUTTON COLDFIELD CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Within Sutton Coldfield : To provide Almshouses and related benefits for elderly beneficiaries. Make grants for the relief of persons who may be elderly, disadvantaged, disabled or in need of medical assistance. To provide special benefits to local education authority schools, places of worship, historic buildings and support community groups, recreation and leisure.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
Total income:
£2,165,000
Donations and legacies | £5.00k | |
Charitable activities | £274.00k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £1.89m | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£2,969,000
Raising funds | £415.00k | |
Charitable activities | £2.55m | |
Other | £0 |
£4,869,000 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £415.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.55m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £415.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.55m | |
Retained for future use | £4.07m |
People

11 Employee(s)
15 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 27 November 1968: Standard registration
- THE SUTTON COLDFIELD MUNICIPAL CHARITIES (Working name)
- SUTTON COLDFIELD MUNICIPAL CHARITIES (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bryan Dunn | Trustee | 19 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Meredith | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brian William Maynard | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Kurt Roberts | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Surrinder Bains | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Henrietta Martin | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fahmida Ismail | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Miles | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Cllr David Pears | Trustee | 18 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cllr Jane Mosson | Trustee | 23 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Cllr. Simon Douglas John Ward | Trustee | 10 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Paula Luckett | Trustee | 13 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Francis Patrick Murray | Trustee | 07 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Charles Morris | Trustee | 11 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW FRANCIS BURLEY | Trustee | 16 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.91m | £1.76m | £2.34m | £2.22m | £2.17m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.94m | £2.24m | £1.92m | £2.22m | £2.97m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £12.45k | £0 | £0 | £5.00k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £202.52k | £214.10k | £216.00k | £235.00k | £274.00k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.71m | £1.53m | £2.13m | £1.99m | £1.89m | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.77m | £1.72m | £1.56m | £1.90m | £2.55m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £171.82k | £513.24k | £353.00k | £324.00k | £415.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £175.98k | £163.41k | £211.00k | £135.00k | £146.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £1.15m | £1.01m | £985.00k | £1.11m | £1.88m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £104.58k | £513.24k | £353.00k | £324.00k | £415.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £843.21k | £640.23k | £746.00k | £1.44m | £10.07m | |
|
Long-term investments | £63.79m | £75.26m | £62.56m | £63.26m | £67.45m | |
|
Other assets | £1.33m | £666.47k | £10.36m | £10.11m | £1.71m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.65m | £1.71m | £1.59m | £1.62m | £1.97m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 01 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 01 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 27 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 27 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 12 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 12 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 07 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 07 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 25 FEB 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: (A) THE PROVISION OF HOUSING ACCOMMODATION FOR BENEFICIARIES AND SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS AS THE TRUSTEES DECIDE. THE LAND IDENTIFIED IN PART I OF THE SCHEDULE TO THIS SCHEME MUST BE RETAINED BY THE TRUSTEES FOR USE AS THE HOMES OF THE CHARITY. ANY SURPLUS INCOME NOT REQUIRED FOR THE OBJECTS ABOVE SHALL BE APPLIED FOR THE OBJECTS BELOW: (B) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS. THE TRUSTEES MAY RELIEVE PERSONS IN NEED BY: (I) MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO THEM; (II) PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR GOODS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES FOR THEM; OR (III) MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO OTHER PERSONS OR BODIES WHO PROVIDE GOODS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES TO THOSE IN NEED. (C) PROVIDING SUCH SPECIAL BENEFITS OF ANY KIND, NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY A LOCAL AUTHORITY OR ACADEMY TRUST, FOR ANY SCHOOL IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT OR SUBSTANTIALLY SERVING THE SAME AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE AGREED BETWEEN THE SCHOOL GOVERNORS OR ACADEMY TRUST (AS THE CASE MAY BE) AND THE TRUSTEES. (D) PROMOTING THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO, PHYSICAL EDUCATION AND EDUCATION IN RESPECT OF THE ARTS) OF PERSONS WHO ARE: (I) UNDER THE AGE OF 25; (II) IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE; AND (III) RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. (E) FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT, IN ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS, EITHER DIRECTLY OR BY WAY OF DONATIONS OR SUBSCRIPTIONS TO INSTITUTIONS OR ORGANISATIONS WHICH APPLY OR WHICH UNDERTAKE IN RETURN TO APPLY THE WHOLE OR PART OF THEIR INCOME FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES: (I) THE RELIEF OF THE ELDERLY WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS; (II) THE RELIEF OF DISTRESS AND SICKNESS; (III) THE PROVISION AND SUPPORT OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION; (IV) THE REPAIR OF HISTORIC BUILDINGS; (V) THE PROMOTION OF THE ARTS; OR (VI) THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION.
Area of benefit
COUNCIL WARDS OF BIRMINGHAM CITY COUNCIL KNOWN AS THE SUTTON COLDFIELD CONSTITUENCY
Linked charities
- 27 November 1968 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
LINGARD HOUSE
FOX HOLLIES ROAD
SUTTON COLDFIELD
B76 2RJ
- Phone:
- 0121 7940970
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window