THE BEDFORD AND DISTRICT SOCIETY FOR PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We support people with learning disabilities in the Bedford area. Also incorporated within Bedford Mencap is Sparkle Club, a weekly social club for adults with learning disabilities in Bedford.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £19,860 from 2 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- BEDFORD MENCAP (Working name)
- SPARKLE CLUB (Working name)
- THE BEDFORD AND DISTRICT SOCIETY FOR MENTALLY HANDICAPPED CHILDREN AND ADULTS (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VANESSA WILSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||||
Laura Sherwood-King | Trustee | 02 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Deepesh Lad | Trustee | 11 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Andrew Munday | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|||||||
Lauren Steels | Trustee | 02 May 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Simon Broomfield | Trustee | 10 March 2016 |
|
|
||||||
DAVID SIMONS | Trustee | 26 April 2012 |
|
|
||||||
MADELINE PUGH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MIKE BONNEY | Trustee |
|
||||||||
VERONICA SCARGILL | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £61.68k | £37.46k | £52.40k | £52.82k | £82.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.07k | £34.55k | £47.92k | £58.77k | £70.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £25.04k | £6.10k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £19.86k | £19.86k | N/A | £19.86k | £19.86k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 15 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 15 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 20 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 20 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 31 July 2020 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 31 July 2020 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES OF THE SOCIETY ADOPTED 14TH NOVEMBER 1955 AS VARIED BY REVISED RULES ADOPTED 13TH APRIL 1961 AND 9TH FEBRUARY 1982 AND SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 16 APRIL 2002.
Charitable objects
1) THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE WITH A LEARNING DISABILITY IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF HELP AND SUPPORT FOR THEM AND FOR THEIR FAMILIES, DEPENDANTS AND CARERS, AND TO PREVENT LEARNING DISABILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND TO ADVANCE RELIGION AMONGST PERSONS WITH A LEARNING DISABILITY. 2) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR PEOPLE WHO HAVE NEED THEREOF BU REASON OF LEARNING DISABILITY WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. "LEARNING DISABILITY" MEANS ANY DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITY OF THE MIND, AND ANY ASSOCIATED CONDITION HOWSOEVER CAUSED AND WHETHER MILD, MODERATE OR SEVERE.
Area of benefit
BEDFORD, KEMPSTON, AMPTHILL
Contact information
- Address:
-
92 CHAUCER ROAD
BEDFORD
MK40 2AP
- Phone:
- 07305088274
- Email:
- ljsk1965@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window