Financial history THE ANGLO-AUSTRIAN SOCIETY

Charity Number: 219015
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £41.27k £25.57k £25.49k £24.92k £24.75k
Total expenditure £31.34k £37.10k £23.98k £26.74k £32.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A