MAYOR OF HARROW'S CHARITY FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Applicants should be resident in London Borough of Harrow. Grants allowed are discretionary based on essential needs rather than desirable, this includes provision of basic living conditions- food, clothing, heating essential furnishings such as beds, cookers, rugs, childcare equip,health treatment. Grants towards holidays/school trips for children from homes in difficult financial circumstances.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 16 May 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Harrow
Governance
- 14 April 1964: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sharon Daniels | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vishal Seegoolam | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cllr Ramji Kanji Chauhan | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Honorary Alderman Camila Bath | Trustee | 05 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Cllr Jean Lammiman | Trustee | 19 May 2018 |
|
|||||
Cllr Sasikala Suresh | Trustee | 19 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
BRENDA DIANA CRIPPS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS GAYE BRANCH | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 19/05/2020 | 19/05/2021 | 26/05/2022 | 18/05/2023 | 16/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.34k | £6.80k | £2.39k | £2.73k | £3.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.78k | £5.05k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 16 May 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 16 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 18 May 2023 | 26 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 26 May 2022 | 20 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 19 May 2021 | 02 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 19 May 2020 | 16 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED DATED 7TH MAY 1958 SCHEME 9TH DECEMBER 1974.
Charitable objects
FOR CHARITABLE AND DESERVING PURPOSES ARISING WITHIN OR WITHOUT THE BOROUGH OF HARROW.
Area of benefit
WITHIN OR WITHOUT THE BOROUGH OF HARROW
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO Box 1358
Harrow
HA3 3QN
- Phone:
- 02084241232
- Email:
- mayor@harrow.gov.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window