SETTLE AND DISTRICT AID IN SICKNESS FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides financial help to persons in short term ill health.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 27 January 1964: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANET HEAP | Chair |
|
||||||
MARGARET AIREY | Trustee | 14 August 2018 |
|
|||||
Sarah Williamson | Trustee | 14 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID TAYLOR | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joe Lord | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Blackburn | Trustee | 10 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN HANSON | Trustee | 07 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT HARRY MOORE | Trustee | 23 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Diane Elphinstone | Trustee | 23 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
PETER ANTHONY GOOLD | Trustee | 18 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
GARETH DAVID ADAMS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.44k | £1.46k | £1.59k | £1.67k | £1.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.01k | £1.21k | £770 | £1.55k | £1.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 15 August 2024 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 18 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 18 March 2023 | 261 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 24 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 24 March 2021 | 267 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 26/10/1960 AS AMENDED 12 DECEMBER 1996 BY A RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 74(2)(C) OR (D) OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993
Charitable objects
GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE SICK POOR RESIDING IN THE PARISHES OF SETTLE, GIGGILESWICK, LANGCLIFFE, HELLIFIELD, HORTON IN RIBBLESDALE, LONG PRESTON, AUTSWICK, BENTHAM, CLAPHAM CUM NEWBY, LAWKLAND WITH ELDROTH, STAINFORTH AND RATHMELL ALL IN THE WEST RIDING OF THE COUNTY OF YORK
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
GRASSRIGG
45 Goodenber Road
Bentham
LANCASTER
LA2 7JE
- Phone:
- 01524298251
- Email:
- settledasf@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window