BOURNVILLE VILLAGE TRUST

Charity number: 219260
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Bournville Village Trust is a leading housing association, founded in 1900 by Geroge Cadbury, with the overall aim of creating and sustaining flourishing communities: By promoting new social housing of good quality which enhances the environment By managing housing stock and estates to the highest standard for all residents By encouraging residents to share in decisions affecting communities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity has one or more trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Birmingham City
  • Shropshire
  • Worcestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 October 1978: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • BOURNVILLE ARCHITECTS (Working name)
  • BOURNVILLE PROPERTYCARE SERVICES (Working name)
  • BOURNVILLE VILLAGE LANDSCAPES (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
  • Homes England
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mark Edward Cadbury Trustee 13 December 2024
None on record
George Robert Woods Trustee 13 December 2024
None on record
William James Michael Cadbury Trustee 08 December 2022
None on record
Derek Douglas Trustee 24 November 2021
None on record
Alison Fisher Trustee 07 October 2021
EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION OF GEORGE FENTHAM, HAMPTON IN ARDEN
Received: On time
GEORGE FENTHAM HAMPTON IN ARDEN CHARITY
Received: On time
BROMSGROVE DISTRICT HOUSING TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
Claire Bowman Trustee 26 March 2020
None on record
Claudia Coulson Trustee 26 September 2019
THE R V J CADBURY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
CAROLINE CADBURY Trustee 12 December 2016
None on record
PROFESSOR PHILIP JOHN LUMLEY Trustee 18 July 2016
None on record
MRS ALISON MCKITTRICK Trustee 20 October 2011
R A AND V B REEKIE TRUST
Received: 6 days late

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £28.81m £28.00m £36.64m £48.94m £32.26m
Total expenditure £28.03m £29.92m £26.27m £25.93m £28.76m
Income from government contracts £2.93m £1.13m £993.83k N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £106.53k £167.87k £7.01k £14.53k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £1.13m £1.24m £1.15m £1.27m £1.89m
Income - Charitable activities £22.32m £21.90m £21.90m £20.72m £19.79m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £225.00k £198.00k £171.00k £218.00k £367.00k
Income - Other £5.14m £4.67m £13.42m £26.73m £10.21m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £28.03m £29.92m £26.27m £25.93m £27.41m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £123.00k £135.00k £171.00k £186.00k £181.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £17.00k £42.00k £49.00k £19.00k £31.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £1.35m

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £167.19m £164.40m £162.93m £168.90m £175.75m
Long-term investments £9.45m £9.45m £9.44m £8.40m £8.40m
Other assets £7.61m £17.97m £8.83m £7.23m £10.11m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£1.25m -£742.00k -£638.00k -£322.00k £0
Total liabilities £155.68m £165.68m £144.81m £125.44m £131.98m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 19 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 19 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 19 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 19 September 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 04 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 04 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 25 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 23 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
CONVEYANCE DATED 29 JULY 1899 AND SCHEME OF THE 31 DECEMBER 1948 AND SCHEME OF 4 APRIL 1975 AND SCHEME OF 10 OCTOBER 1978
Charitable objects
1. THE RESIDENTS SHALL BE POOR PERSONS, PREFERENCE SHALL BE GIVEN TO RETIRED PERSONS FORMERLY EMPLOYED BY CADBURY-SCHWEPPES LTD OR CADBURY BROS. LTD AT ANY FACTORY SOMETIME OPERATED BY CADBURY BROTHERS LTD, AND HUSBANDS, WIVES, WIDOWERS AND WIDOWS OF SUCH PERSONS. 2. CONTRIBUTIONS IN ACCORDANCE WITH PROVISIONS SET DOWN IN SCHEME OF 10 OCTOBER 1978.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Registration history
  • 10 October 1978 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
Bournville Village Trust
350 Bournville Lane
BIRMINGHAM
B30 1QY
Phone:
03003336540
Website:

bvt.org.uk