DAME VIOLET WILLS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 219485
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Managing endowment to provide income, then distributing that money in the form of grants to evangelical Christian causes.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £44,996
Total expenditure: £87,554

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 July 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev DAVID CAPORN Chair
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS', SIDMOUTH.
Received: On time
SCHOOL HOUSE SALCOMBE REGIS DEVON
Received: On time
David Gould Trustee 13 June 2023
None on record
Dr John William Hollman Trustee 30 July 2018
OAKRIDGE BAPTIST CHURCH
Received: On time
John David Norris Trustee 27 June 2018
None on record
Yme Potjewijd Trustee 26 July 2013
WESTERN COUNTIES & SOUTH WALES EVANGELISATION TRUST
Received: On time
WESTERN COUNTIES AND SOUTH WALES EVANGELIZATION TRUST
Received: On time
RACHEL CLARA DAWS Trustee
DR S S SHORT CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
CHRISTIAN WORKERS RELIEF FUND
Received: On time
CHARITY OF LYDIA FLORENCE JELLICOE
Received: On time
JULIAN MARSH Trustee
None on record
REV RAY LOCKHART Trustee
None on record
MRS E STREET Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £76.29k £55.71k £43.69k £46.62k £45.00k
Total expenditure £86.64k £72.61k £74.04k £82.53k £87.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 06 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 06 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 11 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 11 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 01 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 01 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 21 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 01 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
3 CEDAR WAY
PORTISHEAD
BRISTOL
BS20 6TT
Phone:
01275848770
Website:

No information available