THE FLOTTERGATE HOMES GRIMSBY

Charity number: 219533
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provide accommodation

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £27,376
Total expenditure: £5,091

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • North East Lincolnshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 June 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Paying staff
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

45 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Neil Vickers Chair 01 September 2019
GRIMSBY AND CLEETHORPES METHODIST CHURCH CIRCUIT
Received: On time
LINCOLNSHIRE METHODIST DISTRICT
Received: On time
Maureen Ann Mumby-Croft Trustee 01 January 2025
GRIMSBY AND CLEETHORPES METHODIST CHURCH CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Nicola Yvonne Coles Trustee 29 November 2024
GRIMSBY AND CLEETHORPES METHODIST CHURCH CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Elaine Watkinson Trustee 07 November 2024
GRIMSBY AND CLEETHORPES METHODIST CHURCH CIRCUIT
Received: On time
John Francis Batty Trustee 01 October 2024
GRIMSBY AND CLEETHORPES METHODIST CHURCH CIRCUIT
Received: On time
HANNAH HEPWORTH Trustee 12 March 2024
GRIMSBY AND CLEETHORPES METHODIST CHURCH CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Susan Blott Trustee 04 January 2024
GRIMSBY SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA
Received: On time
GRIMSBY AND CLEETHORPES METHODIST CHURCH CIRCUIT
Received: On time
BETHANY JADE WATKINSON Trustee 23 October 2023
GRIMSBY AND CLEETHORPES METHODIST CHURCH CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Patricia Crawshaw Trustee 07 March 2023
GRIMSBY AND CLEETHORPES METHODIST CHURCH CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Richard Andrew Melling Trustee 16 March 2022
GRIMSBY AND CLEETHORPES METHODIST CHURCH CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Elizabeth Hudson Trustee 12 February 2022
GRIMSBY AND CLEETHORPES METHODIST CHURCH CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Hilda Melanie Dickerson Trustee 01 October 2020
GRIMSBY AND CLEETHORPES METHODIST CHURCH CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Rev Jade Bath Trustee 17 September 2020
GRIMSBY AND CLEETHORPES METHODIST CHURCH CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Hazel Denise Salters Trustee 03 March 2020
GRIMSBY AND CLEETHORPES METHODIST CHURCH CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Rev John Michael Lowe Boardman Trustee 04 February 2020
GRIMSBY AND CLEETHORPES METHODIST CHURCH CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Rev Ian Harry Wales Trustee 04 February 2020
GRIMSBY AND CLEETHORPES METHODIST CHURCH CIRCUIT
Received: On time
April Anne Baker Trustee 13 May 2019
GRIMSBY AND CLEETHORPES METHODIST CHURCH CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Rev Patrick James Mickleburgh Trustee 13 May 2019
GRIMSBY AND CLEETHORPES METHODIST CHURCH CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Stephen Frederick Funnell Trustee 13 May 2019
GRIMSBY AND CLEETHORPES METHODIST CHURCH CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Rev Barry Robert Armson Trustee 13 May 2019
GRIMSBY AND CLEETHORPES METHODIST CHURCH CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Rev SUSAN CHAMBERS Trustee 13 May 2019
GRIMSBY AND CLEETHORPES METHODIST CHURCH CIRCUIT
Received: On time
DIANNE BURROWS Trustee 13 May 2019
GRIMSBY AND CLEETHORPES METHODIST CHURCH CIRCUIT
Received: On time
ANN CONN Trustee 13 May 2019
GRIMSBY AND CLEETHORPES METHODIST CHURCH CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Rev Alexander Conn Trustee 13 May 2019
GRIMSBY AND CLEETHORPES METHODIST CHURCH CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Elizabeth Kathleen Ede Trustee 13 May 2019
GRIMSBY AND CLEETHORPES METHODIST CHURCH CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Dr MICHAEL BRIAN GOUGH Trustee 13 May 2019
GRIMSBY AND CLEETHORPES METHODIST CHURCH CIRCUIT
Received: On time
JOHN DEREK HOLROYD Trustee 13 May 2019
GRIMSBY AND CLEETHORPES METHODIST CHURCH CIRCUIT
Received: On time
JOAN VALERIE HOLROYD Trustee 13 May 2019
GRIMSBY AND CLEETHORPES METHODIST CHURCH CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Andrew MIchael Hornsby Trustee 13 May 2019
GRIMSBY AND CLEETHORPES METHODIST CHURCH CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Rev Hazel Humphries Trustee 13 May 2019
GRIMSBY AND CLEETHORPES METHODIST CHURCH CIRCUIT
Received: On time
DAVID STEPHEN LAMLE Trustee 13 May 2019
GRIMSBY AND CLEETHORPES METHODIST CHURCH CIRCUIT
Received: On time
RUBY IRENE MUNNINGS Trustee 13 May 2019
GRIMSBY AND CLEETHORPES METHODIST CHURCH CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Rev John Donald Robinson Trustee 13 May 2019
GRIMSBY AND CLEETHORPES METHODIST CHURCH CIRCUIT
Received: On time
MATTHEW WILLIAM TAYLOR Trustee 13 May 2019
GRIMSBY AND CLEETHORPES METHODIST CHURCH CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Angela Wilson Trustee 13 May 2019
GRIMSBY AND CLEETHORPES METHODIST CHURCH CIRCUIT
Received: On time
JEFFREY ALAN FIELDSEND Trustee 13 May 2019
GRIMSBY AND CLEETHORPES METHODIST CHURCH CIRCUIT
Received: On time
ANGELA RUTH CONSTANT Trustee 13 May 2019
GRIMSBY AND CLEETHORPES METHODIST CHURCH CIRCUIT
Received: On time
JOHN DAVID DICKERSON Trustee 13 May 2019
GRIMSBY AND CLEETHORPES METHODIST CHURCH CIRCUIT
Received: On time
MALCOLM CULLUM Trustee 13 May 2019
GRIMSBY AND CLEETHORPES METHODIST CHURCH CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Elizabeth Kershaw Trustee 13 May 2019
None on record
Cheryl Hughes Trustee 13 May 2019
None on record
Rev Katie Deakins Trustee 12 October 2018
GRIMSBY AND CLEETHORPES METHODIST CHURCH CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Jacqueline Bishop Trustee 01 August 2018
GRIMSBY AND CLEETHORPES METHODIST CHURCH CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Elizabeth Ann Norman Trustee 12 June 2018
GRIMSBY AND CLEETHORPES METHODIST CHURCH CIRCUIT
Received: On time
KENYA KIDS
Received: On time
CENTRE4 LIMITED
Received: On time
KENNETH HERRICK Trustee
GRIMSBY AND CLEETHORPES METHODIST CHURCH CIRCUIT
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £16.01k £14.28k £15.13k £23.81k £27.38k
Total expenditure £13.90k £32.39k £55.61k £14.26k £5.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 03 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 03 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 05 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 04 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 25 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 15 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
107 WELHOLME AVENUE
GRIMSBY
DN32 0BP
Phone:
01472871199
Website:

grimsbycleethorpesmethodists.com