THE INCORPORATED BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE CHARTERED INSTITUTE OF PATENT ATTORNEYS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RELIEF OF POVERTY
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 December 1963: Standard registration
- THE INCORPORATED BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE CHARTERED INSTITUTE OF PATENT AGENTS (Previous name)
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Suzanne Marie Oliver | Trustee | 07 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Paul Dean | Trustee | 10 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Charles Robert Clark | Trustee | 10 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
CAROL ALICE ARNOLD | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|||||
Samantha Jane FUNNELL | Trustee | 04 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
LEE MARK DAVIES | Trustee | 24 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL ARTHUR LYND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr CHRISTOPHER THOMAS EYLES | Trustee |
|
||||||
JOHN DAVID BROWN BSC, CPA | Trustee |
|
||||||
STEPHEN JOHN MOHUN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.31k | £55.18k | £62.24k | £67.79k | £74.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.97k | £57.42k | £35.54k | £35.41k | £30.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 19 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
05 April 2024
(These accounts |
19 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 22 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 22 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26TH OCTOBER 1936 AND AMENDED 24TH MAY 1978
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE AT NEED BY MEANS OF GRATUITOUS PECUNIARY OR OTHER ASSISTANCE ANY NECESSITOUS PERSON WHO IS OR HAS AT ANY TIME BEEN A FELLOW OR HONORARY MEMBER OF THE CHARTERED INSTITUTE OF PATENT AGENTS, AS ASSOCIATE THEREOF QUALIFIED BY EXAMINATION, A STUDENT ATTACHED THERETO OR A MEMBER OF ANY COMPARABLE CLASS OF PERSONS IN MEMBERSHIP OR OF ATTACHMENT TO THE SAID INSTITUTE. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3.1 OF THE MEMORANDUM OF ASSOCIATION).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o CIPA
2nd Floor Viaro House
20-23 Holborn
LONDON
EC1N 2JD
- Phone:
- 020 7405 9450
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window