Financial history TODMORDEN WAR MEMORIAL FUND (1914/1918)

Charity number: 219673
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £17.55k £5.80k £0 £6.33k £6.03k
Total expenditure £5.18k £4.40k £8.87k £16.30k £10.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A