UFM WORLDWIDE

Charity number: 219946
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Christian Missionary Agency

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Brazil
  • Bulgaria
  • Burkina Faso
  • Burma
  • Cameroon
  • Canada
  • Congo (Democratic Republic)
  • Djibouti
  • France
  • Germany
  • Greece
  • Hungary
  • India
  • Iraq
  • Ireland
  • Israel
  • Italy
  • Ivory Coast
  • Jordan
  • Kenya
  • Malawi
  • Moldova
  • Mongolia
  • Nepal
  • Nicaragua
  • Papua New Guinea
  • Peru
  • Portugal
  • Romania
  • Scotland
  • Sierra Leone
  • Slovenia
  • South Africa
  • Spain
  • Tajikistan
  • Thailand
  • Togo
  • Turkey
  • Uganda
  • Ukraine
  • United States

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 February 1970: Standard registration
  • 18 January 1994: Removed
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jason Elliot Duffin Chair
THE SHAFTESBURY CHRISTIAN TRUST
Received: On time
GLENCROFT PROPERTIES
Received: On time
THE GENERAL BAPTIST CHURCH MINISTER'S SUPPORT FUND
Received: 11 days late
THE DEO GLORIA TRUST
Received: On time
UNITED BEACH MISSION TRUST
Received: On time
Victoria Buss Trustee 28 November 2022
None on record
Geoff Bunting Trustee 14 June 2021
None on record
Graeme Huw Morgan Powell Trustee 06 March 2017
None on record
REV IAIN SHAW Trustee 05 October 2015
None on record
Rev RICHARD MYERSCOUGH Trustee
None on record
Rev DAVID CARMICHAEL Trustee
None on record
MATTHEW DAFYDD EVANS Trustee
None on record
Rev GERAINT BRYN JONES Trustee
THE TEFE TRUST
Received: On time
Rev STEVEN CURRY Trustee
None on record
KIRSTEN MARY WYNN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.83m £3.64m £4.39m £3.81m £4.26m
Total expenditure £3.67m £3.43m £3.88m £4.11m £3.87m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £44.15k £2.58k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £3.76m £3.61m £4.37m £3.73m £4.15m
Income - Other trading activities £334 £20 £1.22k £520 £0
Income - Charitable activities £27.19k £0 £630 £50.46k £40.77k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £36.85k £25.61k £25.50k £31.41k £69.92k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £72.63k £23.62k £142.10k £124.42k £213.53k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.56m £3.39m £3.88m £4.09m £3.86m
Expenditure - Raising funds £107.50k £48.10k £3.54k £14.32k £14.68k
Expenditure - Governance £9.04k £9.58k £10.58k £9.72k £11.09k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £78 £48
Expenditure - Investment management £7.78k £7.37k £8 £7.89k £9.66k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £1.05m £1.11m £1.18m £936.74k £926.90k
Long-term investments £955.49k £1.09m £1.08m £1.62m £2.08m
Other assets £475.76k £644.92k £1.07m £502.38k £505.52k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £69.99k £97.14k £48.81k £77.28k £68.58k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 22 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 22 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 21 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 21 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 02 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 02 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 10 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 08 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
MINUTES OF COUNCIL MEETING OF 16TH MARCH 1970
Charitable objects
TO GIVE PENSIONS AND/OR ACCOMMODATION AND/OR GRATUITIES TO MISSIONARIES, SECRETARIES OR STAFF RETIRING FROM FULL TIME WORK WITH THE MISSION
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 23 February 1970 : Standard registration
  • 18 January 1994 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
UFM Worldwide
Unit 10
Interface Business Park
Bincknoll Lane
Royal Wootton Bassett
SWINDON
Phone:
01793610515