Financial history THE HUDDERSFIELD WAR MEMORIAL TRUST FUND

Charity Number: 220016
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £27.06k £29.71k £33.19k £34.52k £36.42k
Total expenditure £30.75k £32.00k £30.50k £32.50k £34.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A