Financial history NATIONAL STAR FOUNDATION

Charity number: 220239
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £29.95m £32.29m £36.41m £40.06m £43.04m
Total expenditure £28.91m £31.12m £36.19m £38.53m £41.71m
Income from government contracts £28.45m £30.05m £31.98m £35.58m £39.83m
Income from government grants £459.93k £680.99k £809.26k £316.35k £380.49k
Income - Donations and legacies £881.78k £901.30k £2.41m £2.48m £821.86k
Income - Other trading activities £132.41k £74.61k £150.73k £149.80k £134.61k
Income - Charitable activities £28.75m £31.11m £33.54m £36.74m £40.77m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £7.44k £17 £25.86k £139.80k £275.07k
Income - Other £187.55k £206.26k £285.42k £543.53k £1.04m
Income - Legacies £3.10k £268.13k £1.38m £193.89k £94.60k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £28.42m £30.69m £35.81m £38.13m £41.32m
Expenditure - Raising funds £360.05k £384.15k £321.65k £324.78k £321.77k
Expenditure - Governance £35.53k £32.04k £39.67k £38.97k £50.99k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £135.37k £44.88k £61.96k £78.56k £67.58k