SIR ALEC BLACK'S CHARITY

Charity number: 220295
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity provides bed linen to charitable organisations throughout the UK caring for the sick and infirm for use on in-patient beds and provides assistance to sick poor persons resident in the Borough of Grimsby, particularly those associated with the fishing industry.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 12 April 2024

Total income: £92,697
Total expenditure: £177,566

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Isle Of Man
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 December 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOHN NICHOLAS HARRISON Chair 19 January 1988
THE TURLEIGH VILLAGE CLUB AND GARDEN
Received: On time
Peter Ashley Harrison Trustee 15 May 2024
None on record
Michael Parker Trustee 16 November 2010
GRIMSBY YOUTH ZONE
Received: On time
THE FRANCIS ARTHUR BROOKES CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE HAWERBY TRUST
Received: On time
Dr DIANA FRANCES WILSON Trustee 07 May 1993
None on record
STEWART WILSON Trustee 19 January 1988
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 12/04/2020 12/04/2021 12/04/2022 12/04/2023 12/04/2024
Total gross income £107.92k £96.60k £89.19k £88.60k £92.70k
Total expenditure £117.55k £119.50k £126.49k £136.96k £177.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 12 April 2024 02 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 12 April 2024 02 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 12 April 2023 04 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 12 April 2023 04 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 12 April 2022 02 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 12 April 2022 02 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 12 April 2021 12 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 12 April 2021 12 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 12 April 2020 22 March 2021 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 12 April 2020 22 March 2021 38 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
27 OSBORNE STREET
GRIMSBY
N E LINCS
DN31 1NU
Phone:
01472348315
Website:

No information available