Trustees THE SUFFOLK HORSE SOCIETY
Charity Number: 220756

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mrs Sue Wager | Chair | 28 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Bruce Denton Smith | Trustee | 26 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Christine Oakley | Trustee | 26 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW PETER BUNDOCK | Trustee | 26 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Julie Margaret Turner | Trustee | 26 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Anne Hayter | Trustee | 26 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Fiona May Fleming | Trustee | 26 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Bruce Langley Mckim | Trustee | 22 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Andrea Hoskins | Trustee | 24 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
JAYNE ELIZABETH GROOM | Trustee | 14 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
GAIL SPRAKE | Trustee | 14 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alan John Hawes | Trustee | 27 April 2019 |
|
|||||
George Thomas Pratt | Trustee | 27 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Timothy SMITH | Trustee | 21 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
MR MARK DONSWORTH | Trustee | 21 April 2018 |
|
|||||
CHERYL JOYCE GROVER | Trustee | 21 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
FRANCIS ADRIAN KINGE | Trustee | 18 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ROBERT LATHAM | Trustee | 18 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER KARL SPALDING | Trustee | 18 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
NEIL SYRETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN WILLIAM FLEMING | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.