Financial history FRIARSGATE TRUST

Charity number: 220762
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £117.24k £98.13k £111.67k £118.90k £118.27k
Total expenditure £136.68k £117.04k £176.66k £142.43k £125.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A