THE BALLINGER WAR MEMORIAL HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Village hall available for hire for local activities and including WI, NADFAS, yoga,pilates, shortmat bowls, horticultural society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 02 July 1963: Standard registration
- BALLINGER HALL (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DANIEL RICHARD WOLFE | Chair | 26 September 2023 |
|
|||||
James Hick | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|||||
RACHEL ELIZABETH PARKER | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne Ellis | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS ROSE | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Farrelly | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jeff Evans | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT KELLY | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Ogden | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Veronica Simpson | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chloe Lewis | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER DAVID GLYN-JONES CBE | Trustee | 16 September 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.47k | £21.44k | £26.24k | £22.52k | £14.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.41k | £12.90k | £7.46k | £20.34k | £14.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £19.10k | £2.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 12 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 14 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 22 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 23 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 3RD JUNE 1926
Charitable objects
HALL FOR THE BENEFIT, ENJOYMENT AND ENTERTAINMENT OF THE INHABITANTS OF BALLINGER, SOUTH HEATH, POTTER ROW, LITTLE HUNDRIDGE AND PEDNOR.
Area of benefit
BALLINGER,SOUTH HEATH,POTTER ROW,LITTLE HUNDRIDGE AND PEDNOR
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ballinger War Memorial Hall
Ballinger
GREAT MISSENDEN
Buckinghamshire
HP16 9LQ
- Phone:
- 07798610970
- Email:
- drichardwolfe@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
ballingerhall.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window