THE VICTORIA HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintenance of the Victoria Hall in Oakham for use by the public and local organisations for recreation, public functions, weddings and parties.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Rutland
Governance
- 29 July 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thomas Tyler | Chair | 05 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Burrows | Trustee | 05 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stewart Drummond | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Anne Stringer | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Graham | Trustee | 11 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Patsy Clifton | Trustee | 02 July 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.23k | £41.59k | £34.51k | £32.73k | £56.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.14k | £36.13k | £33.58k | £34.33k | £52.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £11.81k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £19.08k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 22 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 22 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 04 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 04 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 26 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 26 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEMES OF 15 AUGUST 1899, 12 FEBRUARY 1915 AND 25 NOVEMBER 1974
Charitable objects
PROMOTION AND ENCOURAGEMENT OF AGRICULTURE IN THE COUNTY OF RUTLAND
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF RUTLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
Victoria Hall
39 High Street
OAKHAM
LE15 6AH
- Phone:
- 01572 722496
- Email:
- info@victoriahall.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window