THE JOHN ROPER BOUNTY FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Annual party for children
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Lancashire
Governance
- 14 January 1964: Standard registration
- "THE JOHN ROPER BOUNTY FUND" (Previous name)
- Investment
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lesley Hutcheson | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
ANDREW JOHN COLLIER | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||
Rev Gregor Stewart | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35 | £29 | £32 | £35 | £37 | |
|
Total expenditure | £85 | £192 | £85 | £89 | £20 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 February 2024 | 118 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED AT LIVERPOOL PR ON THE 24 FEBRUARY 1927
Charitable objects
(I) THE PAYMENT OF SUBSCIPTIONS OF $1 1S. OD. TO THE WHITECHAPEL SCHOOL LENDING LIBRARY. $1 1S. OD. TO THE PRESTON INFIRMARY AND $3 3S. OD. TO THE PRESTON POLICE AID CLOTHING SOCIETY. (II) THE RELIEF AND NURSING OF THE DESERVING AND SICK POOR ESPECIALLY MATERNITY CASES AND CHILDREN IN WHITECHAPEL AND IN THE PROVISION OF AN ENTERTAINMENT WITH LIGHT REFRESHMENTS TO BE GIVEB ANNUALLY TO THE CHILDREN AND ADULTS OF THE WORKING OR LABOURING CLASS IN WHITECHAPEL.
Area of benefit
WHITECHAPEL AND PRESTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Spring Bank
Garstang
PRESTON
PR3 1QX
- Phone:
- 01995601957
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window