CHURCH BURGESSES TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust makes grants: to support general charitable purposes for the benefit of the people of Sheffield, and to support the religious and other charitable work of the Church of England in Sheffield.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£1,963,551
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £1.96m | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£2,105,632
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £2.11m | |
Other | £0 |
£10,135 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.11m |
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 14 August 1964: Standard registration
- SHEFFIELD CHURCH BURGESSES TRUST (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adrian Watson Little | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Prof Robert Edward Coleman | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Dr Susan Mary Gentle | Trustee | 30 July 2020 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Elizabeth Ann Brownhill | Trustee | 26 July 2018 |
|
|||||||||||||||
STEPHEN ECCLESTON | Trustee | 08 February 2018 |
|
|||||||||||||||
MR D STANLEY | Trustee | 12 March 2007 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Dr JULIE PATRICA BANHAM | Trustee | 12 March 2006 |
|
|||||||||||||||
IAN GEOFFREY WALKER | Trustee | 12 March 2002 |
|
|||||||||||||||
MR D F BOOKER | Trustee | 12 March 1998 |
|
|||||||||||||||
RVEREND SAP Hunter | Trustee | 12 March 1993 |
|
|||||||||||||||
NICHOLAS JAMES ANTHONY HUTTON MBE | Trustee | 12 March 1988 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.93m | £1.65m | £1.97m | £1.94m | £1.96m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.75m | £1.76m | £1.82m | £1.99m | £2.11m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £6.45k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.92m | £1.65m | £1.97m | £1.94m | £1.96m | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £6.45k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.75m | £1.76m | £1.82m | £1.99m | £2.11m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £258.71k | £254.30k | £296.23k | £305.73k | £314.92k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £780.26k | £765.54k | £783.77k | £813.21k | £928.63k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £35.92m | £36.61m | £40.39m | £35.80m | £36.11m | |
|
Other assets | £4.55m | £2.80m | £2.55m | £2.15m | £1.74m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £777.87k | £402.71k | £613.97k | £616.97k | £639.77k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 8/6/1554, AS VARIED BY COMMISSION SCHEME SEALED 23/8/1999, SUPPLEMENTAL ROYAL CHARTER DATED 8/5/2003 & RESOLUTION UNDER S75A 12/4/10 AND AS AMENDED 1 APRIL 2014, EXCLUSIVE OF THE EDUCATIONAL FOUND'N CONSTITUTED BY ORDER OF THE COMMISSION SEALED 16/2/1904 AS AMENDED ON 09 JUL 2018 AS AMENDED ON 26 JAN 2021 AS AMENDED ON 09 JAN 2025
Charitable objects
A) TO PAY 17.8% OF THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY TO THE TRUSTEES OF THE CHARITY CALLED THE CHURCH BURGESSES EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION FOR APPLICATION BY THE THOSE TRUSTEES FOR THE PURPOSES OF THAT CHARITY; B) TO APPLY A FURTHER 71.5% OF THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY FOR ECCLESIASTICAL PURPOSES AS PROVIDED FOR AT CLAUSE 10 OF THE 1999 SCHEME; C) TO APPLY THE REMAINING 10.7% OF THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY TO BE APPLIED FOR GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS PROVIDED FOR AT CLAUSE 11 OF THE 1999 SCHEME; 1. ECCLESIASTICAL PURPOSES THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE INCOME FOR ECCLESIASTICAL PURPOSES IN THE FIRST PLACE IN PAYING SUCH SUMS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE AFTER CONSULTATION WITH THE PROVOST IN OR TOWARDS THE STIPENDS OF THE TWO CHAPLAINS OF THE CATHEDRAL CHURCH OF ST PETER AND ST PAUL, SHEFFIELD HOLDING OFFICE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE CONSTITUTION AND STATUTES OF THE SAID CATHEDRAL CHURCH. 2. GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY FOR GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF SHEFFIELD. **FOR FULL DETAILS SEE CLAUSES 7-11 OF CHARITY COMMISSION SCHEME SEALED 23 AUGUST 1999.
Area of benefit
SHEFFIELD GENERALLY (SEE 1999 SCHEME)
Contact information
- Address:
-
WRIGLEYS SOLICITORS LLP
DERWENT HOUSE
150 ARUNDEL GATE
SHEFFIELD
S1 2FN
- Phone:
- 01142675588
- Email:
- ian.potter@wrigleys.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window