NEWFIELD CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 221440
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Grants are awarded to females aged 40 years and under who live in Coventry or Leamington Spa and who are in need.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £63,142
Total expenditure: £91,889

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Coventry City
  • Warwickshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 October 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JEAN RAWLINGS Chair 16 March 2016
None on record
Judith Sharpe Trustee 14 January 2025
None on record
Claire Finn Trustee 06 December 2023
None on record
PAT SMITH Trustee 05 December 2017
None on record
Rev Barbara Carol Clutton Trustee 02 December 2015
STRETTON ON DUNSMORE CHARITIES
Received: On time
HERBERT EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
JOHN CLIFFORD BARRETT Trustee 27 August 2014
MARY ANN EVANS HOSPICE
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £73.79k £53.41k £56.53k £56.70k £63.14k
Total expenditure £77.89k £76.36k £67.27k £60.57k £91.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 30 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 17 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 17 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 17 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 17 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 30 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 01 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Rotherham & Co
8/9The Quadrant
COVENTRY
CV1 2EG
Phone:
02476227331
Website:

No information available