THE HOSPITAL OF GILBERT, EARL OF SHREWSBURY AT SHEFFIELD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. Maintenance of Almshouses which are occupied by in-pensioners. 2. Grants to other local charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£536,816
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £30.42k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £506.40k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£878,215
Raising funds | £252.86k | |
Charitable activities | £625.35k | |
Other | £0 |
£158,719 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £252.86k | |
Charitable expenditure | £625.35k |
People

3 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 20 September 1963: Standard registration
- SHREWSBURY HOSPITAL (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THE DUKE OF NORFOLK | Chair |
|
|
|||||||||||||||
Caroline Hanson | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Katrina Blandy Mayson | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Henry Miles Arundel | Trustee | 20 November 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Nicholas Robert Bown Robsinson | Trustee | 09 May 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
OLIVER GEORGE STEPHENSON MA HONS | Trustee | 01 July 2014 |
|
|||||||||||||||
NICHOLAS JAMES ANTHONY HUTTON MBE | Trustee | 17 September 2011 |
|
|||||||||||||||
PHILIP CHARLES WENTWORTH HOWARD | Trustee | 07 February 1982 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £585.11k | £554.21k | £532.77k | £538.88k | £536.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £676.59k | £713.56k | £796.52k | £802.73k | £878.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £37.19k | £34.98k | £23.65k | £24.12k | £30.42k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £547.92k | £519.23k | £509.12k | £514.76k | £506.40k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £545.65k | £574.75k | £663.73k | £640.70k | £625.35k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £130.94k | £138.80k | £132.79k | £162.03k | £252.86k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £31.00k | £36.74k | £38.21k | £41.69k | £42.46k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £80.29k | £100.00k | £75.00k | £75.00k | £75.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £99.18k | £47.33k | £51.10k | £49.58k | £44.97k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £3.25m | £3.22m | £3.27m | £3.27m | £3.26m | |
|
Long-term investments | £13.25m | £13.41m | £14.02m | £13.23m | £12.97m | |
|
Other assets | £248.31k | £278.74k | £194.24k | £231.76k | £268.38k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £213.65k | £233.07k | £239.82k | £291.52k | £243.55k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL OF GILBERT, EARL OF SHREWSBURY, VARIOUS ACTS OF PARLIAMENT AND SCHEMES OF 9 JUNE 1959, 21 OCTOBER 1982 AND 16 SEPTEMBER 1985. AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 08 NOV 2017
Charitable objects
A) IN RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS OTHERWISE QUALIFIED AS IN-PENSIONERS OF THE HOSPITAL WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS, B) IN RELIEVING IN CASES OF NEED PERSONS RESIDENT IN OR NEAR SHEFFIELD WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED OR INFIRM BY PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES WHICH ARE CALCULATED TO ALLEVIATE THE SUFFERING OR ASSIST THE RECOVERY OF SUCH PERSONS IN SUCH CASES BUT ARE NOT READILY AVAILABLE TO THEM FROM OTHER SOURCES. IF AT ANY TIME THERE SHALL BE A SURPLUS OF THE INCOME OF THE HOSPITAL AFTER PROVIDING FOR THE DUE MAINTENANCE OF THE HOSPITAL AND OF ITS OFFICERS, IN-PENSIONERS AND OUT-PENSIONERS.
Area of benefit
SHEFFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fowler Sandford
4th Floor Abbey House
Leopold Street
Sheffield
S1 2GY
- Phone:
- 0114 266 7171
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window