Financial history THE CAUTIONARY LANDS CHARITY

Charity Number: 221902
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £30.43k £386 £274 £113 £180
Total expenditure £2.09k £873 £4.34k £3.13k £2.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A