Trustees THE CAUTIONARY LANDS CHARITY

Charity Number: 221902
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MICHAEL PHILIP WORTHINGTON Chair 01 August 2012
CHEDDLETON FLINT MILL INDUSTRIAL HERITAGE TRUST
Received: On time
JOHN POINTON SPORTS AND RECREATION FACILITY
Received: 20 days late
Rev Henry Hope Trustee 01 April 2025
THE HERMIONE WARREN MEMORIAL TRUST
Received: On time
Malcolm Frank Cunningham Trustee 12 October 2023
WETLEY ROCKS VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
Harold Jennings Trustee 01 July 2018
None on record
CHRISTINE MARY CARTER Trustee 01 January 2015
None on record
ROBERT MILNER Trustee 01 August 2012
None on record
DAVID ANTHONY HALLEN Trustee
None on record
HERBERT JOHN TUNNA Trustee
None on record
MAHFOOZ AHMAD Trustee
WETLEY ROCKS VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
LEEK TOWN CENTRE YOUTH PROJECT
Received: 43 days late