THE SHAFTESBURY SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In June 2007, The Shaftesbury Society merged with John Grooms, a fellow Christian charity providing care, support and holiday services for disabled people; from that date we transferred our activities together with those of John Grooms to Grooms-Shaftesbury, now formally known as Livability, creating the largest Christian disability charity in the country.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England
Governance
- 15 April 1969: Standard registration
- 15 May 2000: Removed (Funds spent up (s.75))
- SHAFTESBURY (Working name)
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Duncan George Ingram | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Livability | Trustee | 18 August 2007 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £772 | £5.48k | £3.14k | £1.14k | £825 | |
|
Total expenditure | £726 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £825 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2022 | 358 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INC 1893 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS PASSED 12/6/1914, 14/9/1917, 3/3/1944, 17/3/1950, 16/2/1951, 25/4/1967, 30/9/1986, 24/3/1987, 11/9/1995, 11/9/1996 AND 24/9/99.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH BY ENABLING PEOPLE IN GREAT NEED TO ACHIEVE SECURITY, SELF-WORTH AND SIGNIFICANCE BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF: - 3.1. ACCOMMODATION (INCLUDING ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES), CARE (INCLUDING DOMICILIARY AND RESPITE CARE), EDUCATION, SUPPORT, ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE FOR CHILDREN, YOUNG PERSONS AND ADULTS (INCLUDING ELDERLY PERSONS) WHO ARE IN CHARITABLE NEED OF SUCH PROVISION BY REASON OF DISABILITY, CHRONIC ILLNESS, PHYSICAL OR MENTAL DEPENDENCY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR ANY OTHER CAUSE; 3.2. VOCATIONAL EDUCATION, TRAINING AND RE-TRAINING FOR YOUNG PEOPLE AND ADULTS WITH DISABILITIES OR WHO THROUGH THEIR SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES ARE OTHERWISE IN NEED AND UNABLE TO GAIN EMPLOYMENT OR WHO ARE THREATENED WITH UNEMPLOYMENT; 3.3. FACILITIES, SUPPORT, ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE FOR CHRISTIAN CONGREGATIONS, OTHER CHRISTIAN GROUPINGS AND COMMUNITY GROUPS SEEKING TO ALLEVIATE SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION; 3.4. SUPPORT, ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE FOR PARENTS, GUARDIANS AND OTHER CARERS OF CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND ADULTS WITH DISABILITIES AND WHO ARE IN CHARITABLE NEED OF SUCH PROVISION; 3.5. HELP FOR PEOPLE IN CHARITABLE NEED TO IDENTIFY AND MEET THEIR OWN PHYSICAL, MENTAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL NEEDS AND THE CHARITABLE ASSISTANCE THEY MAY REQUIRE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Linked charities
- BARCLAY'S HORSLEYDOWN MISSION CHARITY
- CHISWICK MISSION
- CONEY HILL SCHOOL WILL TRUSTS
- ELEANOR GELDERD
- GEORGE FREDERICK FROOMS
- HIGHWAY EVANGELICAL CHURCH
- JANE BALD MAXTON
- JOHN KIRK CRIPPLES HOME FUND
- JOSIAH FOSTER COT
- KING EDWARD INSTITUTION ENDOWMENT FUND
- LILIAN JANE CLARKE FOR GIFFORD HALL
- MARGARET SHORT COLES
- MARMADUKE LEVITT'S GIFT
- MARSH STREET MISSION
- MR AND MRS ARTHUR BENTALL
- SAMUEL HALE BIBBY ENDOWMENT FUND
- SHOEBLACK SOCIETY FUND
- THE BEDDINGTON FUND
- THE PLATT MISSION
- THE SHAFTESBURY WELCOME MISSION
- WILLIAM FREDERICK URRY
- 15 April 1969 : Standard registration
- 15 May 2000 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
Coburg House
1 Coburg St
Gateshead
NE8 1NS
- Phone:
- 02074522000
- Email:
- info@livability.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window