MELTON MOWBRAY TOWN ESTATE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Parks and leisure.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 30 August 1963: Standard registration
- MELTON MOWDRAY TOWN ESTATE (Previous name)
- TOWN ESTATE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GRAHAM BETT | Chair | 07 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr DAVID MICHAEL STEVENS | Trustee | 02 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison D'Angelo | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Gray | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Hilary Misiuda | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Eric Tindall | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
KEITH HALLAM | Trustee | 02 October 2017 |
|
|||||
ADRIENNE HOLLAND | Trustee | 02 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
IAN ANTHONY NEALE | Trustee | 07 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD SAGE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER ALBERT ROFFEY OBE DL | Trustee |
|
||||||
MR TIM WEBSTER | Trustee |
|
||||||
DEREK FREDRICK WHITEHOUSE MBE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £502.34k | £571.42k | £531.09k | £514.68k | £497.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £623.27k | £612.73k | £670.98k | £599.53k | £652.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £195.04k | £75.45k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £3.07k | £0 | £195.54k | £76.47k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £162.96k | £161.29k | £85.47k | £129.30k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £132.30k | £117.53k | £102.15k | £148.87k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £197.16k | £142.60k | £143.80k | £133.13k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £6.85k | £150.00k | £4.13k | £26.91k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £431.33k | £411.46k | £441.77k | £383.17k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £191.94k | £201.27k | £229.21k | £216.36k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £19.30k | £25.46k | £22.21k | £30.64k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £324 | £9.94k | £9.52k | £8.50k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 1 DECEMBER 1989 as amended on 23 Jun 2020 as amended on 02 Sep 2024
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN SUCH WAYS AS THE FEOFFEES THINK FIT,
Area of benefit
MELTON MOWBRAY
Contact information
- Address:
-
TOWN BAILIFFS COTTAGE
2 PARK LANE
MELTON MOWBRAY
LEICESTERSHIRE
LE13 0PT
- Phone:
- 01664564559
- Email:
- enquiries@mmte.co.uk
- Website:
-
meltonmowbraytownestate.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window