MORPETH DISPENSARY

Charity number: 222352
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Assistance to poor, sick in Morpeth and surrounding area. Requests are received from third parties - usually Social Services, Citizens Advice Bureau, etc - and donations are paid to that third party for the benefit of the recipient. Requests during the last financial year were for such items as washing machines, cookers, decorating, furnishing, clothing etc.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £3,326
Total expenditure: £3,569

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Northumberland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 September 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alison O'Donnell Trustee 27 August 2020
None on record
Vivienne Sommerville Trustee 27 August 2020
None on record
Elaine Willmore Trustee 14 January 2019
THE COBWEB ORCHESTRA
Received: On time
Dr John M Myers Trustee 02 June 2015
None on record
Pauline Young Trustee 10 June 2013
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST AIDAN, ST JAMES AND ST MARY THE VIRGIN, MORPETH
Received: On time
LADY ELIZABETH GREY REST FUND
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £3.31k £3.30k £3.30k £3.35k £3.33k
Total expenditure £1.91k £2.53k £1.50k £5.98k £3.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 31 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 15 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 12 November 2020 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
1 Dacre Court
Dacre Street
MORPETH
Northumberland
NE61 1HW
Phone:
01670512484
Website:

No information available