KENDAL ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of housing for the elderly and those in need within the parishes of Kendal (Cumbria) and specific adjoining parishes. Housing stock of 41 units.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 July 2017
Total income includes £308,000 from government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cumbria
Governance
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 01/07/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £145.67k | £469.17k | £185.98k | £208.73k | £420.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £102.54k | £119.31k | £124.82k | £126.75k | £53.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £32.50k | £308.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 July 2017 | 26 April 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
01 July 2017
(These accounts |
26 April 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 16 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2016
(These accounts |
16 October 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 14 September 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | 14 September 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 02 June 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | 02 June 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 2 DECEMBER 1987 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 05 APR 2017
Charitable objects
THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS IN THE ALMSHOUSES OF THE CHARITY OR ANY OF THEM IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT IN THE TOWN OF KENDAL AND THE PARISHES OF HELSINGTON, NATLAND, NEW HUTTON, PATTON, SCALTHWAITERIGG, SKELSMERGH, STRICKLAND KETEL, STRICKLAND ROGER AND UNDERBARROW AND BRADLEYFIELD.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window