WESTMORLAND MENCAP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides services & human resources for children & adults with learning disabilities. Also provides advice & information in this regard, as well as acting as an 'umbrella' organisation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cumbria
Governance
- 15 May 1992: Standard registration
- WESTMORLAND MENCAP SOCIETY (Working name)
- WESTMORLAND SOCIETY FOR MENTAL HANDICAP (Previous name)
- WESTMORLAND SOCIETY FOR MENTAL HANDICAPPED (Previous name)
- WESTMORLAND SOCIETY FOR MENTALLY HANDICAPPED (Previous name)
- WESTMORLAND SOCIETY FOR THE MENTALLY HANDICAPPED (Previous name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTINE HARRISON | Chair | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karen Kidd | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marilyn Ruth Irons | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev GRIFF JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.69k | £0 | £11.32k | £7.52k | £4.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.06k | £161 | £245 | £9.33k | £5.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1964 AS AMENDED 8TH NOVEMBER 1989 AND 28 NOVEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE WITH A LEARNING DISABILITY IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF HELP AND SUPPORT FOR THEM AND FOR THEIR FAMILIES, DEPENDANTS AND CARES, AND TO PREVENT LEARNING DISABILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND TO ADVANCE RELIGION AMONGST PERSONS WITH A LEARNING DISABILITY; AND B)TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR PEOPLE WHO HAVE NEED THEREOF BY REASON O F LEARNING DISABILITY WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE
Area of benefit
WESTMORLAND
Linked charities
- 15 May 1992 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
Denecrest Guest House
13 Woodland Road
Windermere
LA23 2AE
- Phone:
- 07500112139
- Email:
- gfell01@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window