HENRY JAMES SAYER CHARITY

Charity number: 222438
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Help for those in need in Birmingham and surrounding areas.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £71,539
Total expenditure: £74,360

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Birmingham City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 December 2006: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
STEPHEN JOHN JONES Chair
THE GITTA TANGYE TRUST
Received: On time
HOLGATE DOLPHIN CIO
Received: On time
Olivia Delores Hinds Trustee 27 October 2021
None on record
Jayne Foxall Trustee 08 May 2019
None on record
SUMAN PRASHER Trustee 14 May 2013
None on record
LINDA BUSHELL Trustee 24 October 2012
None on record
JEFF BAKER Trustee 24 October 2012
None on record
FIONA COLLINS Trustee
RICHARD KILCUPPE (OTHERWISE FIELD) CHARITY
Received: On time
THE JOHN AVINS TRUST
Received: On time
CANA TRUST
Received: 42 days late
JOHN RUSSELL Trustee
LICHFIELD CONDUIT LANDS
Received: On time
MUNICIPAL CHARITIES
Received: On time
BIRMINGHAM STOCK EXCHANGE BENEVOLENT FUND
Received: On time
TESSA MITCHELL Trustee
ST FRANCIS YOUTH AND COMMUNITY CENTRE
Received: On time
DIANA COPPLESTONE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £79.88k £83.10k £96.69k £69.86k £71.54k
Total expenditure £83.41k £74.17k £84.85k £69.80k £74.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 08 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 08 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 05 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 05 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 22 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 22 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 18 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 18 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 09 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 09 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
AN ORDER OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 8TH AUGUST 2006, AND BY RESOLUTION MADE ON 31 OCTOBER 2006
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE CITY OF BIRMINGHAM WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
WEST MIDLANDS
Registration history
  • 01 December 2006 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
Registered Office - Shakespeare Martineau
1 Colmore Square
BIRMINGHAM
Email for Correspondence Address
B4 6AA
Phone:
07940 160 844
Website:

No information available