THE TEXTILE INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE THE GENERAL INTERESTS OF THE TEXTILE INDUSTRIES WORLDWIDE, MORE PARTICULARLY IN RELATION TO THE ACQUISITION AND APPLICATION THERETO OF KNOWLEDGE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

35 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Argentina
- Australia
- Austria
- Bangladesh
- Belgium
- Bulgaria
- Canada
- China
- Croatia
- Czech Republic
- Denmark
- Egypt
- Estonia
- Finland
- France
- Germany
- Ghana
- Greece
- Hong Kong
- India
- Indonesia
- Ireland
- Isle Of Man
- Israel
- Italy
- Japan
- Kenya
- Kuwait
- Macau
- Malaysia
- Mauritius
- Netherlands
- New Zealand
- Nigeria
- Northern Ireland
- Norway
- Pakistan
- Poland
- Portugal
- Scotland
- South Africa
- South Korea
- Spain
- Sri Lanka
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- Taiwan
- Thailand
- Turkey
- United States
Governance
- 09 February 1970: Standard registration
- 27 February 1996: Removed
- TI INTERNATIONAL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
35 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Prof Jess Power | Chair | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Holly Morris | Trustee | 27 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Navdeep Singh Sodhi | Trustee | 27 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sunil Kumar Puri | Trustee | 27 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Boden Colebourn | Trustee | 27 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jason Kent | Trustee | 27 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charles Wood | Trustee | 27 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Vishaka Karnad | Trustee | 27 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Vadiraj Tilgul | Trustee | 27 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Prof Vinod Shanbhag | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Watkins | Trustee | 30 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Saniyat Islam | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicole Morarescu | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Joanne Conlon | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Abid Iqbal Ganaie | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Joe Cunning | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Petit | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jane Wood | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Prof Pammi Sinha | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Prof Malgorzata Ziminiewska | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Muhammad Nusrat Ali Chishti | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Prof Raechel Margaret Laing | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Prof Rohana Upendra Kuruppu | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Yuk Ming Calvin Lam | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Prof Eng Dr Ayub Nabi Khan | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anne Elizabeth Creigh-Tyte | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Timir Baran Roy | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Rowe | Trustee | 25 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anastasia Vouyouka | Trustee | 25 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Prof Subbiyan Rajendran | Trustee | 25 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Prof Dr Kimti Gandhi | Trustee | 25 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH FOX | Trustee | 20 June 2020 |
|
|||||
Prof Subhash Chander Anand | Trustee | 01 May 2020 |
|
|||||
Katie Greenyer | Trustee | 17 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Helen Rowe | Trustee | 15 May 2008 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £316.53k | £275.66k | £239.67k | £331.55k | £303.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £308.59k | £269.04k | £269.18k | £311.01k | £329.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | £1.46k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER 11 MARCH 1925, SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER 24 NOVEMBER 1955 AND BYE-LAWS DATED 1956. AMENDMENTS TO THE CHARTER AND VARIATIONS TO THE BYE-LAWS DATED 19 MAY 1999.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE GENERAL INTERESTS OF THE TEXTILE INDUSTRY, MORE PARTICULARLY IN RELATION TO THE ACQUISITION AND APPLICATION THERETO OF SCIENTIFIC KNOWLEDGE. TO PROMOTE THE PROFESSION AND PRACTICE OF TEXTILE TECHNOLOGY, WHICH FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS OUR CHARTER, ANY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER AND THE BYE LAWS OF THE INSTITUTE SHALL MEAN THE ARTS, SCIENCES AND TECHNOLOGIES RELATING TO FIBRES, TO ALL PRODUCTS MADE FROM FIBRES, YARNS, FABRICS OR OTHER TEXTILE MATERIALS - INCLUDING CONGENEROUS PRODUCTS MADE FROM FIBROUS MATERIALS - HOWSOEVER PROCESSED OR PRODUCED AND INCLUDING THE RELEVANT FIBROUS MATERIALS THEMSELVES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 09 February 1970 : Standard registration
- 27 February 1996 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
8TH FLOOR
ST JAMES' BUILDINGS
79 OXFORD STREET
MANCHESTER
M1 6FQ
- Phone:
- 01612371188
- Email:
- tiihq@textileinst.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window